IL HB2914 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, if the taxpayer requests and is owed a refund as a result of an overpayment of any tax due under this Act, and if the refund is not paid within 180 days after the return is filed, then the taxpayer may request that the amount of the unpaid refund be applied to the taxpayer's liability in any future tax year. The taxpayer shall not be required to pay penalties or interest on the portion of the future tax liability paid with the refunded amounts. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-REFUNDS IN FUTURE YEARS
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2914&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB2914.htm |