IL HB2910 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the court may approve the placement of a minor in an out of state residential treatment center upon application by the Department of Children and Family Services when the court determines that the placement of the minor in an out-of-state residential treatment center is in the best interest and is the least restrictive, most family-like setting for the minor. Provides that the Department's application shall include an explanation of what in State resources, if any, the Department considered for the minor and why the minor cannot be placed in a residential treatment center or other placement in this State, an explanation as to how the out-of-state residential treatment center will impact the minor's relationships with family and other individuals important to the minor and what steps the Department will take to preserve those relationships, an explanation as to how the Department will ensure the safety and well-being of the minor in the out-of-state residential treatment center and an explanation as to why it is in the minor's best interest to be placed in the out-of-state residential treatment center, including a description of the minor's treatment needs and how those needs will be met in the proposed placement. Provides that this provision does not apply to an out-of-state placement of a minor in a family foster home, relative foster home, a home of a parent, or a dormitory or independent living setting of a minor attending a post-secondary educational institution. Defines "residential treatment center". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-OUT OF STATE PLACEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-04-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2017-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054051-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-27.2New CodeSee Bill Text
7054052-28Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback