IL HB2897 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall investigate and apply for federal funding opportunities, including, but not limited to, a specified federal grant, to support maternal mental health, to the extent that programs are financed, in whole, by federal funds. Provides that the Department shall file a report with the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2021 of the Department's efforts to secure and utilize the federal funding it receives from its efforts. Provides that the amendatory Act's provisions are repealed on January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-FEDERAL FUNDING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0070
2019-07-12HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-07-12HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-04-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-10SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 016-000-000
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mental Health Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-21HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-21HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-14HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-455New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback