IL HB2873 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that it is unlawful for the Department of Transportation, its employees and its agents to knowingly misrepresent any facts in relation to the submission of plans, maps, specifications, costs of construction, bids, or contracts for any Department project.
Title
IDOT-MISREPRESENTATION-PROJECT
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-16 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-09 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 006-005-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2873&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2873.htm |