IL HB2861 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Sets forth the General Assembly's findings concerning the sale of energy drinks to minors. Defines "energy drink" as a beverage that contains the following ingredients or any combination of the following ingredients: (1) taurine, naturally occurring or synthesized; (2) guarana, including any extract or product of the plant or the seed of the plant; (3) glucuronolactone; and (4) any extract, herb, or tuber of any species of ginseng. Provides that it is unlawful in this State for any person to sell, offer for sale, or deliver an energy drink to a person under 18 years of age. Provides that the Director of Public Health is authorized to file a complaint and apply to the circuit court for, and such court may upon hearing and for cause shown grant, a temporary restraining order or preliminary or permanent injunction restraining any person from violating the provision concerning the Sale of energy drinks to minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD-DRUG-ENERGY DRINKS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106203.24New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback