IL HB2831 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act. Provides that a local unit of government may establish a property assessed clean energy program. Provides that, to finance or refinance one or more energy projects on the property covered by the program, a local unit of government may impose an assessment pursuant to the terms of an assessment contract with the record owner of the property to be assessed. Provides that a local unit of government may issue bonds to finance energy projects under a property assessed clean energy program. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROPERTY-CLEAN ENERGY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0077
2017-08-11HouseEffective Date August 11, 2017
2017-08-11HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-17HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 073-028-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-28HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-001-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2831&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2831.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2831eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2831enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0077.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2831ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2831ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2831ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2831ham004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2831_04282017_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2831_05172017_001000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback