IL HB2829 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that uninsured operation of a motor vehicle causing great bodily harm, permanent disability, or death to another person is a Class 4 felony, with a minimum fine of $10,000 and a driver's license revocation for one year. Provides that a second or subsequent violation of operation of a motor vehicle resulting in great bodily harm, permanent disability, or death to another person is a Class 3 felony, with a minimum fine of $20,000 and a lifetime driving privilege revocation. Provides that if a person convicted of uninsured operation of a motor vehicle resulting in great bodily harm, permanent disability, or death to another person has previously been convicted of one or more violations of driving without liability insurance, a fine of $3,000 (rather than $2,500) shall be imposed. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-UNINSURED PENALTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-008-001
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-001-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-707Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-205Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback