IL HB2820 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall work with the Farmers' Market Task Force to address farmers' market vendor complaints regarding the reasonableness of local health departments' fees and sanitation provisions. Provides that farmers' market vendors shall provide effective means to maintain potentially hazardous food at or below a specified temperature. Provides that handwashing stations may be shared by farmers' market vendors. Makes additions to the list of non-potentially hazardous foods that are allowed in provisions concerning the regulation of cottage food operations. Removes an exemption from provisions concerning the regulation of cottage food operations that applies when the gross receipts from the sale of food do not exceed $36,000 in a calendar year. Provides that no later than December 31, 2017, the Department shall include in the Department's cottage food operation application form a statement containing specified content. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FARMERS' MARKETS-COTTAGE FOOD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 005-000-000
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017
2017-05-05SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-002-000
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-09HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106253.3Amended CodeCitation Text
4106254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback