IL HB2814 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions of the Illinois Public Aid Code requiring the Department of Human Services and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to jointly report the number of applications and redeterminations pending long-term care eligibility determination and admission and the number of appeals of denials. Provides that the report shall specify the number of applications, redeterminations, and appeals that have been pending for 0 to 45 days, 46 days to 90 days, 91 days to 180 days, 181 days to 12 months, over 12 months to 18 months, over 18 months to 24 months, and over 24 months (rather than 0 to 90 days, 91 days to 180 days, 181 days to 12 months, over 12 months to 18 months, over 18 months to 24 months, and over 24 months). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LONG-TERM CARE-PENDING APPS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
2017-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305511-5.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback