IL HB2811 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Orthotics, Prosthetics, and Pedorthics Practice Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0269
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019
2019-05-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-24SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-24SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-26HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-03-26HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-03-26HouseRe-assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2019-03-19HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2258475Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback