IL HB2806 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clerks of Courts Act. Deletes language providing that in child support and maintenance cases in counties having a population of not more than 500,000 inhabitants, the clerk, if authorized by an ordinance of the county board, may collect an annual fee of up to $36 from the person making payment for maintaining child support records and the processing of support orders to the State of Illinois KIDS system and the recording of payments issued by the State Disbursement Unit for the official record of the Court.
Title
COURT FEES-CHILD SUPPORT
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Tabled |
2015-03-17 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-03-12 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 105 | 27.1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2806&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2806.htm |