IL HB2802 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to boards of education in school districts having a population of not fewer than 1,000 and not more than 500,000 inhabitants, provides that if, whenever a vacancy occurs, members of the board fail to fill the vacancy within 60 (rather than 45) days after the vacancy occurs, the regional superintendent of schools shall fill the vacancy.
Title
SCH CD-BOARD MEMBER-VACANCY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0067 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |