IL HB2789 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, it is unlawful for any person within the State to knowingly manufacture, deliver, sell, purchase, or possess or cause to be manufactured, delivered, sold, purchased, or possessed a semi-automatic assault weapon, an assault weapon attachment, any .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge. Provides that these provisions do not apply to a person who possessed a prohibited weapon, device, or attachment before the effective date of the amendatory Act if the person has provided proof of ownership to the Department of State Police within 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the person may transfer the weapon or assault weapon attachment only to an heir, an individual residing in another state maintaining that device in another state, or a dealer licensed as a federal firearms dealer. Specifies penalties for violations. Provides exemptions. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-ASSAULT WEAPON&.50 CAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-07-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2789&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2789.htm |