IL HB2788 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Citizen Safety Act. Defines terms as used in the Act. Provides guidelines for law enforcement use of force and deadly force. Determines when the use of force is prohibited and what actions are prohibited in response to protests and large gatherings. Requires officers to report use of force incidents. Requires officers to intervene if another officer engages in the unlawful use of force. Requires the intervening officer to report the unlawful force. Provides guidelines for the use of military equipment and SWAT team activation and deployment. Provides that law enforcement agencies shall implement policies to comply with the Act. Limits home rule powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CITIZEN SAFETY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback