IL HB2785 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to file an amendment to the Home and Community-Based Services Waiver Program for Adults with Developmental Disabilities authorized under the Social Security Act to incorporate telehealth services administered by a provider of telehealth services that demonstrates knowledge and experience in providing medical and emergency services for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Requires the Department to pay administrative fees associated with implementing telehealth services for all persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities who are receiving services under the Home and Community-Based Services Waiver Program for Adults with Developmental Disabilities. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
MEDICAID-TELEHEALTH-ID/DD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2785&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2785.htm |