IL HB2782 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Employment Noncompete Agreement Act. Finds that employers have vested, protectable interests in their customers, clients, and identified prospects that are legitimately protectable through the use of noncompete agreements. Establishes criteria for a valid noncompete agreement between an employer and an employee. Provides that a noncompete agreement may prohibit any solicitation of an employer's existing customers, clients, identified prospective customers, and other employees during the post-employment restriction period. Provides that the restriction period must have a reasonable relationship to an employee's position and salary at the time of termination and may not exceed specified maximum periods based upon annualized compensation. Provides that no specific or additional consideration is required to be paid by an employer to an employee to enforce a noncompete agreement. Establishes remedies.
Title
EMPLOYMENT NONCOMPETE AGREEMNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2782&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2782.htm |