IL HB2755 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-09 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b)
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-09 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b)
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In provisions that allow non-home rule municipalities to impose certain occupation and use taxes for expenditure on public infrastructure, amends the definition of "public infrastructure" to include public schools in the City of Shelbyville. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-SCHOOLS-SHELBYVILLE
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Brown [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Tabled by Senator Rose |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-003-001 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-023-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 012-004-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |