IL HB2754 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act and Illinois Vehicle Code to provide for the issuance of National Wild Turkey Federation license plates. Creates the National Wild Turkey Federation Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that the applicant shall pay an additional fee of $40 for original issuance of the plates, of which $25 shall be deposited into the National Wild Turkey Federation Fund and $15 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that an additional fee of $27 shall be charged for each renewal, of which $25 shall be deposited into the National Wild Turkey Federation Fund and $2 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that moneys in the National Wild Turkey Federation Fund shall be paid as grants to the National Wild Turkey Federation, Inc. for specified purposes.
Title
VEH CD-WILD TURKEY PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0066 |
2013-07-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-07-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-006-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000 |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-006-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.826 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699 | New Code | See Bill Text |