IL HB2740 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the notice of annual application for judgment and sale shall be published in a newspaper circulated (instead of published) in the unit of local government. Provides that, in counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants, notice of the expiration of the redemption period shall be published in a newspaper circulated (instead of published) in the county.
Title
PROP TX-PUBLIC NOTICE
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 22-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2740&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2740.htm |