IL HB2733 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Hazardous Materials Emergency Act. Abolishes the Hazardous Materials Advisory Board and makes conforming changes throughout the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HAZARDOUS MATERIALS BD-ABOLISH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0129
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430502.04Repealed CodeCitation Text
430504Repealed CodeCitation Text
430505.03Amended CodeCitation Text
430505.07Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback