IL HB2698 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that an employer that is able to pay wages and who refuses to pay is guilty of a Class 4 felony (rather than a misdemeanor). Provides that a subsequent failure to pay within 5 (rather than 2) years of a prior conviction is a Class 3 (rather than Class 4) felony.
Title
FAILURE TO PAY WAGE-FELONY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 69 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-05-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-046-001 |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 014-006-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 115 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |