IL HB2694 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Employment of Strikebreakers Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMPLOYMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2015-02-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-20HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
820300.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback