IL HB2674 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a craft distiller license and a craft distiller tasting permit license shall allow the sale and offering for sale at retail for use and consumption on the premises specified in the license any form of alcoholic liquor purchased from a licensed distributor or importing distributor. Provides that a craft distiller tasting permit license allows the licensee to sell and offer for sale at retail, but not for resale in any form, up to 5,000 gallons of transferred alcoholic liquor to the extent approved by the Illinois Liquor Control Commission. Provides that upon approval from the State Commission, a craft distiller tasting permit license shall allow the licensee to sell and offer for sale at (i) the craft distiller's licensed premises and (ii) at up to 2 additional locations for use and consumption and not for resale. Provides that certain craft distillers may sell up to 10,000 gallons (instead of 2,500 gallons) of spirits to non-licensees. Creates a craft distiller warehouse permit. Provides that a craft distiller warehouse permit license may be issued to the holder of a craft distiller tasting permit license and shall allow the holder to store or warehouse up to 500,000 gallons of spirits manufactured by the holder of the permit. Establishes fees for a craft distiller warehouse permit. Makes other changes.
Title
LIQUOR-CRAFT DISTILLER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-12 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-03-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |