IL HB2671 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Adds the State's Attorney's Investigative Subpoenas Article to the Code. Provides that at any time prior to the commencement of a prosecution and upon written application by the State's Attorney, the circuit court shall cause the clerk of the court to issue subpoenas ad testificandum or duces tecum directed to the sheriff or coroner of any county in the State for the purpose of obtaining the testimony of any person or any document or material relevant to a criminal matter being investigated by the State's Attorney. Establishes procedures under which the State's Attorney may apply for the issuance of such subpoenas. Provides that any person appearing before an issuing court in response to a State's Attorney's investigative subpoena shall have the right to be accompanied by counsel. Provides that any proceeding related to the issuance or enforceability of the subpoena, or to the disclosure of information obtained from such subpoena, shall take place in camera and in the presence of the State's Attorney, and at the party's request, the party subpoenaed and his or her counsel, and a court reporter who shall transcribe the proceedings. Provides that except for the State's Attorney's copy, such transcripts shall be sealed and in the event a prosecution is commenced, the transcript shall be disclosed to the accused as provided by law. Provides that the Attorney General, in cooperation with the Illinois State's Attorney Association, shall annually provide a course of training to the State's Attorneys, in the legal, ethical, and practical aspects of the provisions of the Article relating to investigation and prosecutorial functions. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO-STATES ATT-SUBPOENA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana A. Mendoza |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2671&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2671.htm |