IL HB2667 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Healthy Eating Active Living (HEAL) Act. Imposes a tax on distributors of bottled sugar-sweetened beverages, syrups, or powders at the rate of $0.01 per ounce of bottled sugar-sweetened beverages sold or offered for sale to a retailer for sale in the State to a consumer. Requires those distributors to obtain permits. Provides that 2% of the moneys shall be deposited into the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund for the administrative costs of the Department of Revenue, and 98% of the moneys shall be deposited into the Illinois Wellness Fund to be used for wellness programs and for expanded obesity prevention and treatment services for Medicaid beneficiaries. Creates an Advisory Council to govern the distribution of Illinois Wellness Fund moneys. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
HEAL ACT-BEVERAGES
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-03-06 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.866 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 1010 | 1-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2667&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2667.htm |