IL HB2665 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consent by Minors to Health Care Services Act. Provides that a minor of 12 years or older who may have come into contact with any sexually transmitted disease or may be determined to be an intoxicated person or a person with a substance use disorder, or who may have a family member who abuses drugs or alcohol, may give consent to the furnishing of health care services or counseling related to the prevention, diagnosis, or treatment, rather than just the diagnosis or treatment, of the disease.
Title
MEDICAL-MINOR'S CONSENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0214 |
2019-08-07 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-019-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-004-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 062-048-001 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-007-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 210 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |