IL HB2657 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Authorizes the State Superintendent of Education to use moneys in the institute fund and the State Board of Education to use funds available in the Teacher Certificate Fee Revolving Fund to support the recruitment and retention of educators, to support educator preparation programs as they seek national accreditation, and to provide professional development; specifies dedication of moneys. Makes changes concerning a provisional educator or career and technical educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations, a Substitute Teaching License, a general administrative endorsement on a Professional Educator License, out-of-state applicants and applicants trained in another country receiving a Professional Educator License, and professional development activities. Provides that an Educator License with Stipulations with only a paraprofessional endorsement does not lapse. Removes the requirement that an alternative educator licensure program for teachers or a principal preparation program offered by a not-for-profit entity be approved by the Board of Higher Education. In provisions concerning the conviction of certain offenses as grounds for revocation of a license, adds the offense of unauthorized video recording and live video transmission (under certain circumstances) to the definition of "sex offense". Makes changes concerning the training of teachers to teach physical education and safety education. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR LICENSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0058 |
2015-07-16 | House | Effective Date July 16, 2015 |
2015-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; 003-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight |
2015-02-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |