IL HB2654 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs shall provide training to frontline employees at veterans service organizations established under the Act on mental health services to identify veterans who might be at risk of suicidal thoughts. Provides that the training may include, but not be limited to, mental health first aid training and amplified suicide advanced training programs. Provides that the Department shall provide assistance to Veterans Assistance Commissions established under the Military Veterans Assistance Act and veterans' service associations, including, but not limited to, the American Legion, Veterans of Foreign Wars, and AMVETS, in providing the training. Provides that the Department shall find combat veterans to serve as veteran service officers at veterans service organizations established under the Act for the purpose of having veteran services officers who are able to properly relate to fellow combat veterans. Requires the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement these provisions.
Title
VETERANS' SUICIDE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |