IL HB2637 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Removes language providing that Medicaid rates for supportive living facilities effective on July 1, 2018 must be equal to the rates in effect for supportive living facilities on June 30, 2018. Provides that the Medicaid rates for supportive living services on and after July 1, 2019 must be equal to 60% of the average total nursing facility services per diem for the geographic areas defined by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Provides that for supportive living facilities specializing in dementia care, the rate must be 72% instead of 60%. Requires the Medicaid rates for supportive living services to be updated whenever the total nursing facility service per diems are updated. Requires the Department to delink the per diem rate paid for supportive living facility services from the per diem rate paid for nursing facility services, effective for services provided on or after May 1, 2011 through June 30, 2019 (rather than effective for services provided on or after May 1, 2011). Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-SUPPORTIVE FACILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-03-22 | House | To Wages & Rates Subcommittee |
2019-03-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.01a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2637&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2637.htm |