IL HB2628 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that persons under 21 years of age (rather than under 18 years of age) who commit misdemeanor offenses are subject to the proceedings under the Act for delinquent minors. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes.
Title
JUV CT-DELINQUENCY AGE-MISD
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 1-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 1-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 1-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 4-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-401.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2628&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2628.htm |