IL HB2622 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Nurse Assistant Certification Act. Provides that no person may represent himself or herself as a certified nurse assistant, work as a certified nurse assistant, or use the title "certified nurse assistant" or a similar title, unless he or she is certified by the Illinois Department of Public Health. Provides that any applicant for certification who qualifies as a certified nurse assistant under the Nursing Home Care Act shall be certified by the Department. Provides that a person practicing as a certified nurse assistant shall be certified by the Department by July 1, 2010, or the commencement of practice, whichever is later. Provides that any allegation of abuse or neglect of an eligible adult by a certified nurse assistant shall be investigated, whether the abuse or neglect occurred or is alleged to have occurred in a facility or outside of a facility, including any domestic living arrangement as defined under the Elder Abuse and Neglect Act. Provides that if the Department concludes after its investigation that a certified nurse assistant has abused or neglected an eligible adult, then it must take disciplinary action against the certified nurse assistant. Provides a civil penalty for unauthorized practice as a certified nurse assistant. Provides that the Department shall establish by rule the grounds and process for disciplinary action. Defines "abuse", "Department", "eligible adult", "facility", and "neglect". Effective immediately.
Title
NURSE ASSISTANT CERT ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2622&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2622.htm |