IL HB2618 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that a veteran who is certified by the Department of Veterans' Affairs to be at least 10% disabled with service related disabilities or who is in receipt of total disability pension may trap, as permitted by the Code, without procuring a trapping license. Provides further that a military member returning from mobilization and service outside the United States who is an Illinois resident may trap, as permitted by the Code, without paying any fees required to obtain a trapping license, if he or she applies for the license within 2 years after returning from service abroad or after mobilization. Adds trapping licenses to the terminally ill hunter licensing program. Provides that persons on active duty in the Armed Forces or Illinois residents with a Type 1 or Type 4, Class 2 disability as defined in the Illinois Identification Card Act may trap, as permitted by the Code, without procuring a trapping license. Adds definitions. Effective immediately.
Title
WLDLF CD-TRAPPNG LICNSE EXMPT
Sponsors
Rep. Lance Yednock [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.2q-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 5 | 1.2q-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 5 | 2.37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2618&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2618.htm |