IL HB2616 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that the Code shall not apply to the acquisition of modifications or adjustments, including assistive technology devices and services, to provide reasonable accommodations to specified persons. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT CD-EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0600 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |