IL HB2607 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-8)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Requires the Planning and Procurement Bureau to establish a long-term renewable resources procurement plan that includes all renewable energy credits necessary to meet specified goals (replacing the current renewable portfolio standards). Sets forth guidelines for what shall be included in the procurement plan. Makes changes to provisions concerning definitions, the powers of the Agency, the Illinois Power Agency Renewable Energy Resources Fund, and the duties of the Planning and Procurement Bureau. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes changes concerning nondiscrimination, energy efficiency and demand-response measures, natural gas efficiency programs, real-time pricing, infrastructure investment and modernization, the Illinois Smart Grid test bed, and on-bill financing programs for electric and gas utilities. Adds provisions related to renewable energy credit procurement. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that upon promulgation by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency of a final rule regulating carbon dioxide emissions from existing electric generating units, the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency shall be authorized to implement a cap and invest program or similar market mechanism to regulate carbon dioxide emissions. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
RENEWABLE RESOURCE PROCUREMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2015-08-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-08-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2015-08-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-04-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-03-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-03-12 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-03-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-03-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-03-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-03-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5C | New Code | See Bill Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-115D | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 19-140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2607&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2607.htm |