IL HB2592 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Reduces the rate of tax on motor fuel and gasohol to 1.25% (currently, 6.25%). Makes changes concerning the distribution of the proceeds from those taxes. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-MOTOR FUEL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-12-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2023-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2023-08-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2592&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2592.htm |