IL HB2585 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Substance Use Disorder Act. Provides that no person may provide services as a certified peer recovery specialist unless he or she is certified by the Department of Human Services. Provides that an applicant for certification must: be 18 years of age or older; have a high school diploma or a high school equivalency certificate; have a current or past mental illness, substance use, or co-occurring disorder; self-identify as a person who is in recovery from a mental illness, substance use, or co-occurring disorder as part of his or her personal recovery process; have demonstrated self-directed recovery for a minimum of 24 consecutive months; and have successfully completed any required specialized training or education. Provides that the Department may adopt any rules necessary to implement the amendatory Act.
Title
DHS-PEER RECOVERY SPECIALIST
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2585&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2585.htm |