IL HB2585 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that, when a bond is required because a party against whom the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission rendered an award for the payment of money seeks judicial review of the award, the bond requirement may be satisfied by posting collateral or guarantee of payment, which may include an insurance policy, a certificate of self-insurance, or funds in an escrow account. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKERS COMP-REVIEW-COLLATERAL
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2585&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2585.htm |