IL HB2585 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning receiving procedures.
Title
CORRECTIONS-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law; Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2011 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-03-29 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |