IL HB2554 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Increases the maximum reduction under the Senior Citizens Homestead Exemption from $5,000 to $7,000 for taxable year 2017. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-170Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback