IL HB2551 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Requires bidders to obtain an equal pay certificate before a purchasing agency may issue a contract to the bidder. Provides for the Department of Employment Security to issue the certificates. Specifies information to be included in an application for an equal pay certificate. Requires bidders to comply with the Equal Pay Act of 2003, Equal Wage Act, Illinois Human Rights Act, and Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Equal Pay Certificate Fund. Provides for moneys in the Fund to be used to administer the equal pay certificate requirements.
Title
PROCUREMENT EQUAL PAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-13 | House | To Agency Operation Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | 47-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 500 | Art. 47 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |