IL HB2532 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning child support obligations, provides that the liability for the support of a child does not require a previous court order for custody and shall be in conjunction with the child support guidelines set forth in the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that the obligation to support, as provided under the Code, shall be concurrent to any other appropriate State law. Provides that an action to establish or enforce a support obligation, under the Code or under any other Act providing for the support of a child, may be brought subsequent to an adjudication dismissing that action based on specified reasons. Provides that in regard to certain cases, actions and remedies under the Code, the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act, or other State laws shall be cumulative and shall be used in conjunction with one another, as appropriate. Makes corresponding and other changes to the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act and the Illinois Parentage Act of 2015.
Title
CHILD SUPPORT-REMEDIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-06 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 10-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 10-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 10-17.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 10-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 46 | 802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 46 | 906 | New Code | See Bill Text |
750 | 46 | 907 | New Code | See Bill Text |
750 | 5 | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 513.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
750 | 5 | 513.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |