IL HB2528 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Requires the Board of Higher Education to establish a hunger-free campus grant program. Provides that the hunger-free campus grant program shall provide grants to public institutions of higher education that have one or more campuses designated by the Board as hunger-free campuses. Provides for requirements for being designated a hunger-free campus. Provides that the Board shall determine the amount of each grant that shall be used by the public institution of higher education to further address food insecurity among students enrolled in the public institution of higher education. Provides that the Board shall prioritize grants to public institutions of higher education with campuses that serve primarily minority and low-income students and have a high percentage of Pell Grant recipients. Provides that the Board shall submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly no later than 2 years after the establishment of the grant program. Provides for rulemaking. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Hunger-Free Campus Grant Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-HUNGER FREE CAMPUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0435 |
2023-08-04 | House | Effective Date August 4, 2023 |
2023-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-006-000 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-005-000 |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 9.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.990 | New Code | See Bill Text |