IL HB2528 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that if a special county retailers' occupation tax for public safety, public facilities, or transportation or a county school facility occupation tax is imposed, the tax shall be imposed for a period of not less than 5 years but not more than 23 years (rather than no minimum or sunset required). Includes the name of the special county retailers' occupation tax on the ballot, requires sunset language to be on the ballot, and removes ballot language for referenda with a special county retailers' occupation tax with no sunset. Requires that a certified copy of an ordinance which includes a sunset date be provided to the Department of Revenue, which shall discontinue the tax on the sunset date. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code making similar changes to requirements for imposition of taxes under the Non-Home Rule Municipal Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Non-Home Rule Municipal Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Non-Home Rule Municipal Use Tax Act. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY AND MUNI CD-REVENUES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1006.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2528&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2528.htm |