IL HB2527 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Authorizes eligible applicants (defined as a non-profit entity in partnership with a regional superintendent of schools, the chief administrator of an intermediate service center that has the authority to issue a high school diploma, or the Chicago school district) to design a high school diploma program for adult learners. Requires eligible applicants to apply for approval of a program to the State Superintendent of Education. Sets forth other requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ADULT LEARNER-DIPLOMA
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0514 |
2017-09-22 | House | Effective Date September 22, 2017 |
2017-09-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2017-06-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2017-06-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-06-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-06-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-06-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2017-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stadelman |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Stadelman |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-005-002 |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |