IL HB2527 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Authorizes eligible applicants (defined as a non-profit entity in partnership with a regional superintendent of schools, the chief administrator of an intermediate service center that has the authority to issue a high school diploma, or the Chicago school district) to design a high school diploma program for adult learners. Requires eligible applicants to apply for approval of a program to the State Superintendent of Education. Sets forth other requirements. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-ADULT LEARNER-DIPLOMA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26HouseSent to the Governor
2017-06-27HousePassed Both Houses
2017-06-27House3/5 Vote Required
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 109-000-000
2017-06-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2017-06-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2017-06-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-06-25HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-06-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-31HouseArrived in House
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stadelman
2017-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Stadelman
2017-05-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Education; 013-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Education
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-005-002
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10553-15.12aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2527&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2527.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2527eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2527enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2527ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2527ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2527sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2527sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2527_04252017_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB2527_05312017_016000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2527_06272017_002001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB2527_06272017_002000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback