IL HB2514 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Provides that beginning on and after July 1, 2019, any natural person (i) whose immediate previous employer was the State of Illinois, or any State official office contained therein, and (ii) whose position was policy-making or policy-oriented in nature shall, prior to receiving an initial registration for the purposes of lobbying by the Secretary of State, be charged an additional surcharge in the amount of no more than $1,000 or 10% of the salary or other form of compensation earned by that natural person being hired by a client or clients to lobby, whichever is less. Provides that the surcharge shall be imposed on a one-time basis per natural person. Provides that the surcharge requirement only applies to persons registering as lobbyists after the effective date of this amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
LOBBY REGISTRATION-SURCHARGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2514&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2514.htm |