IL HB2503 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that every sheriff's office and every municipal police department shall report on an annual basis to the General Assembly information regarding complaints filed by a member of the public against a law enforcement officer in his or her official capacity. Provides that the annual report shall include, but not be limited to: (1) a redacted copy of each original complaint submitted against each officer; (2) the results of completed investigations or status of any ongoing investigation as a result of a filed complaint; (3) the nature of any disciplinary action taken; and (4) an overall accounting of the number of complaints filed and the number of times discipline was imposed against an officer within a reporting period. Provides that if the office or department does not report any complaints filed, the office or department may be subject to inspection of records by the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPORTING POLICE DISCIPLINE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-03-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5553-6041New CodeSee Bill Text
65510-1-18.1-5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback