IL HB2494 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that a responsible relative shall be provided notice on 3 separate occasions before the suspension of the driver's license of the responsible relative. Provides that the first 2 notices shall be issued by the Illinois Department, and the third notice shall be issued by the Secretary of State. Provides that if the responsible relative fails to avail himself or herself of the opportunities to prevent the suspension of his or her driver's license, the driver's license shall be suspended until the responsible relative meets the criteria for the restoration of his or her driving privileges.
Title
VEH CD-CHILD SUPPORT REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-01-31 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 10-17.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | Ch. 7 Art. VII | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
705 | 105 | 27.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 16 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 46 | 805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 607.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |