IL HB2477 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that no patient who has resided for less than 180 days in any hospital or mental institution (rather than no patient of any hospital or mental institution) in the State shall by virtue of his or her abode at the hospital be deemed a resident or legal voter in an election district in which the hospital or mental institution is situated. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-HOSPITAL & MENTAL INS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1110 |
2018-08-28 | House | Effective Date August 28, 2018 |
2018-08-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; |
2017-03-30 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 003-001-000 |
2017-03-10 | House | To Voter Education & Registration Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 3-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |