IL HB2477 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - To Subcommittee on Election Law
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that no patient who has resided for less than 180 days in any hospital or mental institution (rather than no patient of any hospital or mental institution) in the State shall by virtue of his or her abode at the hospital be deemed a resident or legal voter in an election district in which the hospital or mental institution is situated. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-HOSPITAL & MENTAL INS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateTo Subcommittee on Election Law
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 015-000-000
2017-03-30HouseReported Back To Elections & Campaign Finance Committee;
2017-03-30HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 003-001-000
2017-03-10HouseTo Voter Education & Registration Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1053-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback